THE PROTESTANT TRUTH SOCIETY (INC)

Charity number: 248505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The operation of a Christian Bookshop displaying Bible-based literature. Employing Wickliffe Preachers to proclaim Biblical teaching. The circulation of a bi-monthly magazine and publication of books and leaflets. The operation of a Protestant website promoting Bible truth. Keeping our supporters informed and up to date on issues especially the threat to free speech and our nation's constitution.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £229,647
Total expenditure: £248,391

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1966: Standard registration
  • 30 July 2014: Funds received from 261856 BRISTOL AND CLIFTON PROTESTANT LEAGUE
  • 19 November 2021: Funds received from 256318 PROSTESTANT DISSENTING CHAPEL
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dominic Stockford Chair
THOMAS WILSON EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: 4 days late
CHRIST CHURCH HOUSE
Received: On time
Pooyan Mehrshahi Trustee 15 May 2023
SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY
Received: On time
PROVIDENCE BAPTIST CHAPEL, CHELTENHAM
Received: On time
THE BIBLE LEAGUE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev David Patterson Trustee 09 November 2020
None on record
KEVIN MCGRANE Trustee 30 January 2012
BURY ST EDMUNDS PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION)
Recently registered
LINCOLN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH
Recently registered
BLACKBURN EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH
Received: On time
THE GOSPEL MAGAZINE TRUST
Received: On time
Rt Rev EDWARD JOHN MALCOLM Trustee
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE CONTINUING CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE GOSPEL MAGAZINE TRUST
Received: On time
ST SILAS (CONTINUING CHURCH) TRUST
Received: On time
DUNCAN RODNEY LECINGTON BOYD Trustee
None on record
Rev WILLIAM LEROY SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £179.12k £150.46k £199.47k £165.27k £229.65k
Total expenditure £217.60k £201.28k £200.45k £233.62k £248.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PROTESTANT TRUTH SOCIETY INCORPORAT
184 FLEET STREET
LONDON
EC4A 2HJ
Phone:
02074054960
Website:

protestanttruth.com