THE HAVERING THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 248680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust produces and presents theatre, music and dance to entertain and educate the people of outer East London and Essex, and complements this with an extensive programme of educational and outreach activities, and a guest programme of professional and community events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Kent
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE QUEEN'S THEATRE (Working name)
  • HAVERING THEATRE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
  • HORNCHURCH THEATRE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
  • THEN HAVERING THEATRE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dominic Hedges Chair 18 February 2021
None on record
JOHN WOOD Trustee 12 July 2024
HORNCHURCH HOUSING TRUST
Received: 46 days late
Councillor Trevor Roland Mckeever Trustee 11 July 2024
MARDYKE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Helen Theresa Maddison Trustee 03 April 2024
None on record
Lauren Tamazin Gee Trustee 05 March 2024
None on record
Seema Jassal Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
Philip Andrew Cooke Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
James Harry Taylor Trustee 29 January 2024
None on record
Councillor Paul Alan Middleton Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Jeanette Tulloch-Jordan Trustee 22 May 2023
PARENTS 1ST UK
Received: On time
Dr Richard Dobson Margrave Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Carlotta Redi Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Neha Issar-Brown Trustee 18 February 2021
None on record
Sonja Lahiff Trustee 29 December 2020
None on record
Melvin Wallace Trustee 09 September 2020
THE ROMFORD COMBINED CHARITY
Received: On time
HORNCHURCH HOUSING TRUST
Received: 46 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.60m £2.34m £3.59m £3.98m £4.70m
Total expenditure £4.05m £1.79m £3.21m £4.17m £4.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £549.32k £1.47m £1.27m £805.61k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £142.29k £59.15k £78.56k £37.49k £1.50m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.30m £1.81m £3.08m £3.58m £2.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.30k £2.26k £1.72k £16.48k £25.11k
Income - Other £148.49k £472.05k £430.14k £339.54k £481.12k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.05m £1.79m £3.21m £4.17m £4.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.71k £12.15k £17.43k £17.80k £22.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £716.88k £1.12m £1.22m £1.09m £975.59k
Long-term investments £0 £100 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.06m £957.19k £1.57m £1.60m £1.27m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £770.36k £524.04k £856.77k £945.36k £685.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Queens Theatre
Theatre House
Billet Lane
Hornchurch
RM11 1QT
Phone:
01708462362