BRIGADIER D V AND MRS H R PHELPS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply the income and capital of the trust fund for such charitable purposes, wherever situated, as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 1966: Standard registration
- BRIGADIER & HON MRS DV PHELPS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Working name)
- D V PHELPS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Lawrence | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Peter Maggs | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD VANDELEUR PHELPS | Trustee | 15 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.46k | £20.45k | £22.23k | £21.26k | £18.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.81k | £34.59k | £45.62k | £54.55k | £38.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 May 2022 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 1 APRIL 1966.
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR OBJECT OR PURPOSES OR OBJECTS WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AND IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME OT TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Howes Percival Llp
Flint Buildings
1 Bedding Lane
NORWICH
NR3 1RG
- Phone:
- 01603 281961
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window