LINCOLN CIVIC TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environmental/conservation/heritage - providing advocacy/advice/information to the general public/mankind
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 28 September 1966: Standard registration
- LINCOLN CIVIC TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony John Martin Maltby | Chair | 25 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Pickering | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Cave | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.49k | £1.79k | £2.03k | £3.79k | £7.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.28k | £11.19k | £4.36k | £10.84k | £10.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST DECEMBER 1953.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE NATURAL ARTISTIC AND CULTURAL AMENITIES OF THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD. (FOR FULLER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
CITY OF LINCOLN AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MARY'S GUILDHALL
385 HIGH STREET
LINCOLN
LN5 7SF
- Phone:
- 01522 546422
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window