FRIENDS OF NORWICH CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE FRIENDS OF NORWICH CATHEDRAL EXISTS FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE HISTORIC FABRIC OF THE CATHEDRAL, AND TO PROVIDE FINANCIALLY FOR SPECIFIC NEW PROJECTS WITHIN THE CATHEDRAL PREMISES. ALL MEMBERS RECEIVE TWICE YEARLY MAILINGS, AND MEMBERS ARE ENCOURAGED TO ATTEND LECTURES AND SOCIAL GATHERINGS, AND TO PURCHASE FRIENDS' MERCHANDISE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 December 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles William Legh Barratt | Chair | 09 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
David Vyse | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Peter Robert Gleane Hornor | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Very Reverend Dr Andrew Jonathan Braddock | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Janet Elizabeth Benson | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Christopher Hamilton Dicker | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK SANHAM | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
JEREMY ROBSON | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Angela Mary Capper | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Revd Canon Andrew Bryant | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
FRANCES JENKINSON | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
RODNEY MAYSON | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Lucy Gabriel Mary Heywood | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.57k | £307.61k | £218.66k | £408.26k | £196.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345.04k | £229.25k | £195.05k | £365.63k | £268.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 31/08/1966 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/04/1983 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/1983 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/1989 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 18/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2012 as amended on 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHAPTER OF NORWICH CATHEDRAL ('THE CHAPTER') AND TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC AND FURNISHINGS OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH IN THE SPIRIT WHICH INSPIRED ITS FOUNDER, HERBERT DE LOOSING, WHEN HE CAUSED ITS BUILDINGS TO BE UNDERTAKEN
Area of benefit
NORWICH CATHEDRAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of Norwich Cathedral
65 The Close
NORWICH
NR1 4DH
- Phone:
- 01603 218317
- Email:
- friends@cathedral.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window