PARISH HALL TIBBERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village organisations activities.Public Hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 October 1966: Standard registration
- TIBBERTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT GRIMER | Chair | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARK BARRETT | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
MR CHRIS HARTWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Penzer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54k | £934 | £2.90k | £936 | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £4.98k | £5.89k | £5.01k | £26.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4 MAY 1966
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TIBBERTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TIBBERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Half Pint House
Foredraught Lane
Tibberton
DROITWICH
WR9 7NH
- Phone:
- 01905345259
- Email:
- rob.grimer@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window