THE BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity are helping churches with guidance on legal, property and charity matters as well as having responsibility for various funds and investments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,134,884
Donations and legacies | £800 | |
Charitable activities | £2.87m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.26m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,134,884
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.13m |
People

20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 February 1967: Standard registration
- 30 October 2015: Funds received from 1048387 KINGS CHURCH CLEETHORPES TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christopher Douglas Hanning | Chair | 06 February 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Damien Graham Miller | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
Karen Elizabeth Kaneen | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Hayley Jayne BECKETT | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Mohan Pandian | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Christopher John Jones | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
TIMOTHY JOHN WALKER | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Timothy Ian Chowns | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev ANN LOUISE CHESWORTH | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Ewart Walls | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Jeremy Ponsford | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mr G Ward | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Andrew William Hawksworth | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
The Revd David Lennox | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
MICHAEL ARTHUR SOUTHCOMBE MCIOB | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mr O Obidipe | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
John Levick | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Robert John English | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
KAREN AVERIL MARTINDALE | Trustee | 12 July 2009 |
|
|
||||||||||
STEPHEN PETER WELCH | Trustee | 12 June 2007 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74m | £1.49m | £2.46m | £2.35m | £4.13m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74m | £2.37m | £1.46m | £2.35m | £4.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £100 | £0 | £1.00m | £32.14k | £800 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.56m | £1.34m | £1.41m | £2.00m | £2.87m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £1.00m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £174.95k | £149.05k | £58.38k | £304.18k | £1.26m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £19.51k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.74m | £2.37m | £1.46m | £2.35m | £4.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £4.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £60.24k | £74.44k | £0 | £0 | £80.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £59.17m | £59.50m | £65.26m | £73.18m | £83.91m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £54.90m | £56.11m | £60.87m | £68.79m | £79.52m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/11/1890 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/1963 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ITS PRACTICE ESPECIALLY BY THE MEANS AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM.)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAPTIST HOUSE
PO BOX 44
129 BROADWAY
DIDCOT
OXFORDSHIRE
OX11 8RT
- Phone:
- 01235517754
- Email:
- BUCorporation@baptist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window