The Bloxham Feoffee Estate

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to local services and individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 October 1966: Standard registration
- BLOXHAM FEDFFEE ESTATE (Working name)
- THE BLOXHAM FEOFFEE ESTATE INCORPORATING MRS EMMA BARRETTS CHRISTMAS GIFT (Previous name)
- THE FEOFFEE ESTATE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HENRY GIBBARD | Chair |
|
||||||
SARAH HARRIET BRADFORD | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN FINCH | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Green | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tom Smith | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Bonner | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN THOMAS PREEDY | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GEORGE WELCH | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN JAMES GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ROBERT D'OYLY APLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAN CHARLOTTE WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.02k | £9.85k | £12.11k | £11.25k | £11.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.23k | £4.37k | £3.82k | £21.47k | £9.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 19TH FEBRUARY 1993 as amended on 13 Dec 2021 as amended on 09 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
1. ONE THIRD FOR RELIEF IN NEED (SEE SCHEME). 2. ONE SIXTH TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BLOXHAM TO BE APPLIED BY THE COUNCIL IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THAT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH. 3. THE REMAINING HALF TO BE APPLIED IN SUCH WAYS AS THE FEOFFEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BLOXHAM.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF BLOXHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horelia
The Ridgeway
Bloxham
BANBURY
Oxfordshire
OX15 4NF
- Phone:
- 01295721642
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window