Trustees CANTERBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandra Ellis Trustee 31 December 2024
None on record
Neil Logan-Green Trustee 31 December 2024
None on record
Rev Simon Christopher Tillotson Trustee 31 December 2024
None on record
Iain David Blythe Trustee 01 April 2024
THE APPLETON TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony Richter Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Amanda Elizabeth Ann Boucherat Trustee 07 October 2023
None on record
The Revd Dr Andrew James Bawtree Trustee 11 March 2023
COTTAGER'S ALLOTMENTS
Received: On time
CHRISTIANS TOGETHER IN DOVER
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, RIVER
Received: On time
Rev David Robert Malvern Monteith Trustee 17 December 2022
FRIENDS OF CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL
Recently registered
CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE VENERABLE WILLIAM JONATHAN ADAM Trustee 18 July 2022
ST AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL
Recently registered
THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME
Received: On time
EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE KING'S SCHOOL OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CANTERBURY
Received: On time
KENT WORKPLACE MISSION
Received: On time
The Social Justice Network
Received: On time
JESUS HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Revd. Canon Dr. Jeremy Frederick Worthen Trustee 01 January 2022
THE ASHFORD ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THOMAS TREHEARNE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE THOMAS TURNER D D CHARITY (ONE OF THE ASHFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES)
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASHFORD TOWN
Received: On time
Graham Clifford Codling Trustee 01 January 2022
MARDEN PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Received: On time
Rev Gareth Lee Dickinson Trustee 01 January 2022
CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS
Received: On time
ST LUKE'S HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Rose Hudson-Wilkin Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record
Lt Col -Retd John Peter Morrison Trustee 09 February 2019
CANTERBURY CHRISTIAN COUNCIL LIMITED
Received: On time
CANTERBURY UNIT 67 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Received: On time
Miranda Ford Trustee 18 January 2019
THE CANTERBURY DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE DEAF
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY OF CHARITY FAVERSHAM KENT
Received: On time
Rev Estella Ruth Last Trustee 18 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE BRIDGE GROUP
Received: On time
THE LIVING WELL
Received: On time
Dr John Pedder Moss Trustee 18 January 2019
ST AUGUSTINE'S COLLEGE OF THEOLOGY LTD
Received: On time
The Venrable Darren Miller Trustee 13 January 2018
ASSOCIATION OF FESTIVAL CHURCHES
Received: 127 days late