STEPNEY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 250130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees will consider grants to individuals who reside in the old Metropolitan Borough of Stepney

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £22,807
Total expenditure: £27,649

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CAPTAIN JAMES COOK (Previous name)
  • DAME ALICE ROW (Previous name)
  • THOMAS DAPLYN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TREVOR FRANCIS CRITCHLOW Trustee 27 January 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY
Received: On time
SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
The Portal Trust
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARY BASTOW
Received: On time
THE ST DUNSTAN'S AND ALL SAINTS STEPNEY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE RATCLIFF EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
John William Holtorp Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Gregory James Allen Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Ellie Kershaw Ms Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
Shuhel Malique Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Councillor Abdul Wahid Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Clive Buckman Trustee 03 August 2021
None on record
Darren Williams Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Lee Fearon Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
Sheila McQuade Trustee 10 July 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £26.68k £18.63k £19.27k £19.70k £22.81k
Total expenditure £21.49k £12.46k £18.00k £21.60k £27.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
167-169 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 5PF
Phone:
0300 302 0187
Website:

stepneyreliefinneed.org.uk