THE APPLETON TRUST

Charity number: 250271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charitable purposes of the Church of England within Canterbury Diocese

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £33,837
Total expenditure: £16,248

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Orla Patricia Garratt Trustee 26 June 2024
PASTOS VERDES
Received: On time
Iain David Blythe Trustee 26 June 2024
CANTERBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.14k £32.61k £32.26k £32.89k £33.84k
Total expenditure £29.96k £10.63k £18.03k £12.45k £16.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 October 2024 338 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2024 703 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 July 2022 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 October 2024 1068 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
DIOCESAN HOUSE
LADY WOOTTONS GREEN
CANTERBURY
CT1 1NQ
Phone:
01227459401
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available