COMMONWEALTH FORESTRY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of the CFA is to promote the conservation and sustainable management of the world's forests and the contribution they make to peoples livelihoods. Its purpose is to support the professional development of those working with trees and forests, particularly in Commonwealth Countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Canada
- India
Governance
- 12 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mary Hobley | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stanley McCarter | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||
JOHN MURRAY HUDSON OBE | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER LATHAM | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.30k | £76.94k | £172.24k | £57.63k | £72.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.33k | £74.04k | £78.78k | £77.11k | £76.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 1ST NOVEMBER 1921. SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER 28TH NOVEMBER 1962.
Charitable objects
1) TO FOSTER PUBLIC INTEREST IN FORESTRY. 2) TO SECURE GENERAL RECOGNITION OF THE DEPENDENCE OF TIMBER SUPPLY UPON FOREST MANAGEMENT. 3) TO COLLECT AND CIRCULATE INFORMATION RELATING TO FORESTRY AND THE COMMERICAL UTILIZATION OF FOREST PRODUCTS. 4) TO FORM A CENTRE FOR ALL ENGAGED IN FORESTRY. 5) TO PROVIDE A MEANS OF COMMUNICATION BETWEEN ALL CONCERNED. 6) TO SECURE GENERAL RECOGNITION OF THE BENEFICIAL INFLUENCE OF TREES AND FORESTS IN RELATION TO CLIMATE, THE CONSERVATION OF LAND AND WATER RESOURCES AND TO THE CONSERVATION OF WILD LIFE.
Area of benefit
COMMONWEALTH
Linked charities
- 12 January 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crib
Dinchope
CRAVEN ARMS
SY7 9JJ
- Phone:
- 01588672868
- Email:
- cfa@cfa-international.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window