Financial history ROSEHILL ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 250846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £753.21k £728.67k £642.21k £277.07k £613.74k
Total expenditure £698.40k £653.83k £550.89k £531.53k £672.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £338.17k £394.82k £54.52k £25.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £644.59k £24.52k £18.98k N/A £462.03k
Income - Other trading activities £377 £411 £411 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £81.63k £691.32k £610.39k N/A £130.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £10 £7 £17 N/A £454
Income - Other £26.60k £12.41k £12.41k N/A £20.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £687.25k £583.28k £469.06k N/A £672.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.15k £616 £8.51k N/A £459
Expenditure - Governance £17.15k £5.00k £4.08k N/A £4.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £69.93k £73.32k N/A £0