NATIONAL SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 250851
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of devotional, childrens classes, junior-youth activities, study circles, summer schools. The promotion, protection and adminstration of the Baha'i community in the United Kingdom.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BAHA'I COMMUNITY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shirin Taherzadeh Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Marco Milone Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Dr Ronnie Yousefzadeh Bindra Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Dr Shirin Fozdar-Foroudi Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
OLINGA TAHZIB Trustee 21 November 2016
None on record
ROBERT MATTHEW WEINBERG Trustee 27 April 2015
None on record
Dr Wendi Momen Trustee 01 June 2014
NATIONAL ALLIANCE OF WOMEN'S ORGANISATIONS
Received: On time
BAHA'I AGENCY FOR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
BEDFORD COUNCIL OF FAITHS
Received: On time
THE ASHWORTH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WIDOWS RIGHTS INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
DARREN SMITH Trustee 22 April 2014
SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF STOCKPORT
Received: On time
PATRICK O'MARA Trustee 10 December 2006
FOUNDATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION & COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.91m £9.00m £8.43m £7.03m £6.98m
Total expenditure £6.81m £7.39m £8.57m £7.31m £7.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.31m £8.49m £8.25m £6.86m £6.61m
Income - Other trading activities £216.02k £32.97k £28.93k £20.49k £23.40k
Income - Charitable activities £382.76k £329.30k £55.13k £62.11k £225.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.55k £150.07k £90.48k £86.98k £119.85k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £277.54k £2.26m £1.24m £384.36k £333.83k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.76m £7.33m £8.53m £7.28m £7.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.42k £57.13k £43.01k £27.83k £46.72k
Expenditure - Governance £15.50k £14.53k £15.12k £0 £18.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £5.43m £5.29m £5.14m £7.66m £5.57m
Long-term investments £5.04m £7.36m £8.53m £4.89m £8.13m
Other assets £3.28m £3.55m £3.59m £2.58m £2.63m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.66m £2.85m £3.50m £2.91m £3.53m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 November 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 November 2024 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 RUTLAND GATE
LONDON
SW7 1PD
Phone:
02075842566