REST HAVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rest Haven is an inter-denominational Christian foundation and a non-profit making registered charity. The object of the charity is to relieve in cases of need persons who are sick, convalescent, aged or infirm by providing and maintaining a Christian home. Rest Haven is registered with the Care Quality Commission to accommodate 34 people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 10 June 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Egglesdon | Chair | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Richard Oliver Candlin | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
JOHN ALBERT LEWIS RUSSELL | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
David O'loughlin | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Hearn | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JULIA CHAPPLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £999.60k | £1.19m | £1.23m | £1.25m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £979.67k | £1.10m | £1.18m | £1.23m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £124.22k | £58.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.01k | £127.32k | £68.22k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £986.82k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £1.06m | £1.16m | £1.25m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £775 | £19 | £13 | £606 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £379 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £979.67k | £1.10m | £1.18m | £1.23m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.92k | £20.33k | £23.44k | £33.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 9TH APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
A CHRISTIAN HOME FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED OF PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, AGED OR INFIRM. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF EXETER OR IN THE COUNTY DEVON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rest Haven Residential Home
15 Gussiford Lane
EXMOUTH
EX8 2SD
- Phone:
- 01395272374
- Email:
- admin@resthavencare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window