THE ROYAL WELSH AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of agriculture, horticulture, forestry and conservation, primarily through the society's Summer show, Winter fair and Spring festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£6,980,546
Donations and legacies | £288.63k | |
Charitable activities | £6.53m | |
Other trading activities | £56.27k | |
Investments | £101.69k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,850,133
Raising funds | £39.46k | |
Charitable activities | £6.81m | |
Other | £0 |
£46,930 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £116,734 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £39.46k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.81m | |
Retained for future use | £130.41k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £39.46k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.81m | |
Retained for future use | £177.34k |
People

53 Employee(s)
30 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof E Wynne Jones | Chair | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RHYS DAVIES FRAGS | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denley Jenkins FRAgS | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Thomas Richards FRICS FAAV | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Esyllt Ellis Griffiths | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Emlyn Bigley | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lowri Lloyd Williams | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Hartshorn | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Meredydd James | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard William Kenrick Price | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Emlyn Meurig James FRAgS | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRIAN JONES MBE | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Katherine Anne Atkin-Bowdler | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Rowland Griffiths Davies | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maurice Vaughan | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gwyn Edwards | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Meirion W Owen | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hugh Davies | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Roger Dowdeswell | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALWYN REES | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dafydd Parry Jones FRAgS | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
RHIAN DUGGAN | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Menna Davies | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM HANKS | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD NIXON | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|||||
MR GARETH ROBERTS FRAGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Janet Phillips | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID THOMAS JAMES POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS NICOLA DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.07m | £2.10m | £2.94m | £6.36m | £6.98m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.71m | £2.56m | £2.77m | £6.69m | £6.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £322.90k | £90.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £619.93k | £1.14m | £52.69k | £116.73k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.27m | £865.34k | £805.10k | £1.77m | £288.63k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £39.19k | £11.61k | £23.71k | £43.76k | £56.27k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.70m | £929.84k | £2.06m | £4.52m | £6.53m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £38.59k | £28.17k | £25.13k | £29.85k | £101.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £20.26k | £0 | £28.24k | £553 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £3.00k | £40 | £50.00k | £203.66k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.26m | £2.40m | £2.72m | £6.67m | £6.81m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £446.16k | £160.69k | £54.51k | £21.21k | £39.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £49.37k | £49.37k | £16.34k | £30.65k | £10.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.84m | £10.31m | £9.90m | £9.65m | £9.73m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.01m | £1.04m | £1.20m | £1.38m | £1.68m | |
|
Other assets | £2.84m | £3.24m | £3.76m | £3.06m | £2.59m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £436.26k | £778.54k | £729.28k | £436.50k | £497.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 NOVEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 11 MAY 1989 AND 11 MAY 1993. as amended on 28 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, FORESTRY AND CONSERVATION AND IN PARTICULAR IN WALES. (B) TO ADVANCE SCIENCE, RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN CONNECTION WITH AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, FORESTRY AND CONSERVATION, (C) TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF LIVESTOCK AND THE PREVENTION AND ERADICATION OF DISEASES IN ANIMALS USEFUL TO MAN. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Welsh Agricultural Society Of
Llanelwedd
BUILTH WELLS
LD2 3SY
- Phone:
- 01982553683
- Email:
- requests@rwas.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window