Financial history FURNITURE HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 251683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £152.74k £138.60k £138.33k £189.08k £205.42k
Total expenditure £198.24k £131.32k £147.18k £195.47k £220.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A