GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 251735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £31,852
Total expenditure: £17,356

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 August 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Father Darren Smith SSC Chair 12 April 2015
GENERAL TRUST FUND OF THE CHURCH UNION
Received: On time
CANDIDATES FOR ORDINATION FUND OF THE GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
THE HARRY AND KATIE POLLARD TRUST
Received: 70 days late
Michael Andrew Trustee 08 February 2020
CANDIDATES FOR ORDINATION FUND OF THE GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
HOWARD GADD TRUST
Received: On time
James Farmer Trustee 08 February 2020
CANDIDATES FOR ORDINATION FUND OF THE GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.00k £20.16k £119.85k £165.97k £31.85k
Total expenditure £19.16k £12.34k £113.75k £147.83k £17.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Additional Curates Society Ltd
16 Commercial Street
BIRMINGHAM
B1 1RS
Phone:
07498201137
Website:

guild-of-servers-of-sanctuary.weebly.com