THE JEWISH YOUTH FUND

Charity number: 251902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supports Jewish youth work, leisure activities and informal education for young Jews by providing grants to assist Jewish Youth Organisations with projects, training and equipment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £52,435
Total expenditure: £123,809

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1972: Standard registration
  • 05 April 1990: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • J Y F (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joshua Benjamin Marks Chair 22 September 2022
None on record
Gabriel Turner Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Sara Jacqueline Franks Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Robin Moss Trustee 24 February 2022
KESHET DIVERSITY UK
Received: On time
Lea Caron Helman Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Joseph Louis Woolf Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
ADAM ROSE Trustee
None on record
PHILIPPA JANE STRAUSS Trustee
THE OSTRICH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £75.76k £75.05k £61.87k £52.41k £52.44k
Total expenditure £194.23k £122.52k £221.93k £108.25k £123.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 03 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 03 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 02 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 23 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 30 DECEMBER 1955 AND TRUST DEED DATED 26 OCTOBER 1972 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 5 APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN OR ASSIST IN THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG JEWS AND JEWESSES WITH A VIEW TO THEIR BECOMING JEWISH YOUTH LEADERS AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE UNDERGOING OR HAVE UNDERGONE A COURSE IN THE STUDY OF SOCIAL SCIENCE YOUTH LEADERSHIP OR KINDRED SUBJECTS WITH SUPPLEMENTARY TRAINING IN REGARD TO THE SPECIAL PROBLEMS TO BE DEALT WITH BY YOUTH LEADERS IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY AND TO ASSIST IN MAINTAINING NEEDY YOUTH LEADERS IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 November 1972 : Standard registration
  • 05 April 1990 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
35 BALLARDS LANE
LONDON
N3 1XW
Phone:
07459 451 860