VEDW WOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT OF WOOD FOR BENEFIT OF LOCAL COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 30 October 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY MARY DOGGETT | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin James Morris | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID MEYER | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW HARBOUR | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SLYVIA O'BRIEN | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER GLENN SWEETING | Trustee | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
FRANK JOHN MORGAN MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR HANK JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE ELIZABETH BLOCK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2024 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
USERS TRUST
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CWMDU.
Area of benefit
FORMER PARISH OF CWMDU
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 DANYGRUG
CRICKHOWELL
NP8 1DD
- Phone:
- 01873811016
- Email:
- cwmducouncil@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window