THE REDBOURN MISSIONARY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Redbourn Missionary Trust makes grants to the Redbourn Missionary Housing (1974) Trust which owns and manages 10 properties for the use of missionaries on leave or undertaking further study and of retired missionaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 March 1967: Standard registration
- 04 April 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 April 2014: Funds transferred to 267130 REDBOURN MISSIONARY TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.97k | £3.16k | £858 | £89.00k | £66 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.79k | £44.33k | £10.62k | £1.52k | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 03 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 13 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 13 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 15 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 12TH MARCH 1967
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE SETTLEMENT).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window