Trustees CARLISLE DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Charity number: 251977
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Rhyl Robson | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
The Venerable Stewart John Fyfe | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
David George Dalgoutte | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Janet Busk | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alastair Robert Hugh Cook | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Derek John Bradley BSc FCA | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
John Edwards | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev VERNON ROSS | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|||||||
Jim Johnson | Trustee | 16 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.