HULME'S BOLTON LECTURESHIP CHARITY ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The appointment and maintenance in office of a lecturer being a person in holy orders to minister in the church of St. Peter, the parish church of Bolton, in accordance with the requirements of the scheme of this charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bolton
Governance
- 25 May 1967: Standard registration
- HULMES CHARITY (Working name)
- HULME'S LECTURESHIP CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Louise Hodgkiss | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Richard Cox | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE MAXWELL-HODKINSON FCA FCCA | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
John Stanley Topolinski | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
AUBREY CHAPMAN | Trustee | 11 May 1994 |
|
|
||||||
KEITH LEWIS ACTON | Trustee | 19 March 1986 |
|
|
||||||
STANLEY GORDON WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.65k | £66.03k | £69.91k | £71.67k | £75.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.41k | £31.54k | £59.59k | £59.21k | £67.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23 OCTOBER 1973
Charitable objects
1)TO PROVIDE A LECTURER IN THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER, BOLTON-LE-MOORS, WHO SHALL BE A PRIEST OR DEACON IN HOLY ORDERS. 2) PAYMENT OF A YEARLY STIPEND TO THE LECTURER. 3)TO AUGMENT THE STIPENDS OF THE INCUMBENT AND ANY CURATES OF THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH AND OF EITHER OR EACH OF THE INCUMBENTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST. PHILIP AND ST. CHAD, BOLTON-LE-MOORS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST. PETER, ST. PHILIP AND ST. CHAD, BOLTON-LE-MOORS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Chorley New Road
Bolton
BL1 4QR
- Phone:
- 01204840661
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window