THE HUNTINGDON EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORSHIP, TEACHING, PRAYER, FELLOWSHIP, YOUNG PEOPLES ACTIVITIES COMMUNITY OUTREACH SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN MINISTRY ELSEWHERE. THE CHURCH IS BASED ON A LARGE ESTATE ORIGINALLY BUILT AS A LONDON OVERSPILL ESTATE IN HUNTINGDON, CAMBS, AND STARTED IN THE 1960'S TO SEE THE GOSPEL BEING SHARED AND PREACHED. NO CHARGE IS MADE AND ALL ACTIVITIES ARE OPENLY ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 June 1967: Standard registration
- MEDWAY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- THE OXMOOR EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tessa Marva Foderingham | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Piak Mongkol Kijviriya-Langford | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Doe | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARTIN GEORGE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maria George | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.29k | £22.29k | £15.49k | £14.28k | £17.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.19k | £23.90k | £12.44k | £12.20k | £18.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/12/1966 AS AMENDED ON 04/02/1978 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/1984 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO GLORIFY GOD BY: (A) UNITING CHRISTIANS IN WORSHIP, MINISTRY, PRAYER AND FELLOWSHIP. (B) PROCLAIMING BY WORD AND DEED THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST. (C) BEING CONCERNED ABOUT THE SPIRITUAL CARE AND WELLBEING OF THE PEOPLE IN THE AREA. (D) MAINTAINING AND SUPPORTING AT LEAST ONE WHOLE-TIME CHURCH WORKER, WHO MAY BE CALLED BY THE CHURCH TO SERVE AS ITS PASTOR. (E) TEACHING AND PROCLAIMING THE TRUTHS OF THE DOCTRINAL BASIS AS REVEALED BY GOD IN HOLY SCRIPTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE OXMOOR ESTATE, HUNTINGDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oxmoor Christian Fellowship
Love Oxmoor
The Coneygear Centre
Buttsgrove Way
HUNTINGDON
- Phone:
- 07395927936
- Email:
- medwaycf@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window