THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE NATURALISTS' SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining county recorders for collation of observations in all fields of natural history Publishing regular newsletters and publications Maintaining an active website Running free public meetings on Natural History themes Running free public field trips to places of interest around the county Provision of small grants in support of the Society's objectives Training young naturalists
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 June 1967: Standard registration
- 25 January 2019: Funds received from 1127045 NORTH COTSWOLD ORNITHOLOGICAL SOCIETY
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIET ANN BAILEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Julia Clare Webb | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Lewis | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barrie John Mills | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Louise Kibble | Trustee | 16 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Locke | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Garth Matthews | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Marshall | Trustee | 27 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDY OLIVER | Trustee | 18 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN GREENING | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SMART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEN CSERVENKA | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW JAMES BLUETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | £6.76k | £21.49k | £5.97k | £5.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.63k | £21.54k | £26.66k | £11.20k | £30.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27/02/1967 AS AMENDED ON 13/02/1974 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE BIODIVERSITY TO RECORD AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION RELATING TO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND BIODIVERSITY TO MAINTAIN AND MAKE AVAILABLE REFERENCE AND ARCHIVE MATERIALS FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS AND THE WIDER PUBLIC TO TRAIN AND EDUCATE THE YOUNG AND INEXPERIENCED TO BECOME BETTER NATURALISTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 KINGSMEAD
ABBEYMEAD
GLOUCESTER
GL4 5DY
- Phone:
- 07584 689090
- Email:
- gnsmembership@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window