THE SNOWDONIA SOCIETY/CYMDEITHAS ERYRI
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The leading charity working to protect and enhance the Snowdonia National Park through policy based campaign work, awareness raising and pro active enhancement work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 18 July 1967: Standard registration
- 22 June 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 June 2015: Funds transferred to 1155401 CYMDEITHAS ERYRI THE SNOWDONIA SOCIETY
- CYMDEITHAS ERYRI (Working name)
- SNOWDONIA SOCIETY (Working name)
- SNOWDONIA NATIONAL PARK SOCIETY (Previous name)
- SNOWDONIA NATIONAL PARK SOCIETY CYMDEITHAS PARC CENEDLAETHOL ERYRI (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.94k | £102.69k | £198.81k | £116.38k | £123.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.96k | £132.49k | £197.84k | £144.02k | £101.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 21 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 21 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 27 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 27 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 15 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 15 November 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1967 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 1987, 11 NOVEMBER 1995, 4 OCTOBER 1997 & 12 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO WORK TO CONSERVE THE SCENERY, THE NATURAL AND HISTORIC FEATURES AND THE WILD LIFE WITHIN THE PARK AND TO KEEP THEM UNIMPAIRED FOR THE ENJOYMENT OF PRESENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window