Financial history STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 253242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.06m £3.45m £4.75m £4.35m £5.19m
Total expenditure £4.14m £3.01m £3.85m £4.93m £5.53m
Income from government contracts £18.15k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £125.33k £929.39k £298.61k £103.33k £85.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.87m £2.64m £3.18m £1.77m £2.62m
Income - Other trading activities £543.30k £25.66k £350.97k £590.38k £674.48k
Income - Charitable activities £1.62m £136.32k £1.08m £1.97m £1.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.83k £12.49k £13.78k £23.24k £50.74k
Income - Other £0 £636.87k £121.06k £0 £10.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £166.20k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.58m £2.76m £3.41m £4.33m £4.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £566.05k £243.50k £439.67k £594.94k £689.73k
Expenditure - Governance £17.07k £0 £39.50k £42.73k £42.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £6.11k £0 £5.70k £5.38k £5.58k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0