SHEFFIELD ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association is established for the relief of persons who have Spina Bifida and/or hydrocephalus or allied or related disorders who are resident or were formerly resident in the Sheffield postal district by providing for their care, welfare, treatment, education and integration into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 May 1968: Standard registration
- SHEFFIELD ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA & HYDROCEPHALUS (Working name)
- THE SHEFFIELD ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE GODDARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Zanib Malik | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elissia Powell | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steph Horan | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Beale | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Tippett | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hughes | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Allen | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.94k | £43.62k | £71.83k | £73.70k | £88.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.56k | £56.20k | £61.16k | £67.95k | £75.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF THE 2 OCTOBER 1967 AND RULES ADOPTED 1 MAY 1966 AS AMENDED 21 JUNE 1975 AND 12 OCTOBER 1994.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SPINA BIFIDA AND/OR HYDROCEPHALUS OR ALLIED OR RELATED DISORDERS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WERE FORMERLY RESIDENT IN THE SHEFFIELD POSTAL DISTRICT BY PROVIDING FOR THEIR CARE, WELFARE, TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD POSTAL DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHASBAH
Barbara and Les Base (BL10)
57 Burton Street
SHEFFIELD
S6 2HH
- Phone:
- 07752665411
- Email:
- info@shasbah.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window