TRUST PROPERTY DANISH LUTHERAN CHURCH OF ST NICOLAI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of church buidings for benefit of congregation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 12 August 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY MCCOLLIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Charlotte Theill | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Susanne Veien Bolwig Gilbert | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
graham Gilbert | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
DANISH CONSUL | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PETER AAROSIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SWEDISH CONSUL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.06k | £4.06k | £2.15k | £2.52k | £2.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.96k | £3.96k | £3.58k | £3.64k | £4.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 JUNE 1973 AND 4 JUNE 1973
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEE SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN MAINTAINING, REPAIRING, FURNISHING AND EQUIPPING THE BUILDINGS, IN MAINTAINING THE SERVICES IN THE CHURCH AND SO LONG AS REQUIRED THEREFORE, IN MAINTAINING AND REPAIRING THE VICARAGE AT 17 ALLDERIDGE AVENUE IN THE CITY OF KINGSTONE UPON HULL.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DANISH SEAMENS CHURCH
104 OSBORNE STREET
HULL
HU1 2PN
- Phone:
- 01482225469
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window