VILLAGE HALL MOGERHANGER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is used by many different groups for activities including, childrens parties, whist drives, parish council meetings, other village social events. The new extension has created opportunities for lettings from people inside and outside the village and we have moved forward increasing the number of people hiring the hall for their many different activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 13 August 1968: Standard registration
- 08 January 2025: Funds received from 1169339 THE FRIENDS OF MOGGERHANGER VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Hilliard | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Parker | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Warren | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Heath | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Anthony Mercer | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Alan Ebbage | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
LINDA MAY HEATH | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.04k | £80.58k | £29.89k | £18.78k | £22.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.72k | £82.61k | £28.68k | £26.31k | £25.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED THE 20TH JUNE 1938
Charitable objects
A LIBRARY, READING ROOM, LECTURE HALL, WOMEN'S INSTITUTE AND MEN'S CLUB AND GENERALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OR OTHERWISE FOR THE SOUND MORAL EDUCATION AND MENTAL AND PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT DEVELOPMENT RECREATION AMUSEMENT AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH AND VILLAGE OF MOGERHANGER AND OF THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD FOR A RADIUS OF 2 MILES FROM THE HALL.
Area of benefit
MOGERHANGER
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. CATHERINES
BEDFORD ROAD
MOGGERHANGER
BEDFORD
MK44 3RQ
- Phone:
- 01767640798
- Email:
- lindaheath10@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window