THE FISHERIES SOCIETY OF THE BRITISH ISLES

Charity number: 256475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the FSBI shall be to encourage, promote and support all branches of fish biology and fisheries science and conservation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Belgium
  • Canada
  • Chile
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Greece
  • Iceland
  • Ireland
  • Italy
  • Northern Ireland
  • Philippines
  • Portugal
  • Scotland
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 September 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FSBI (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Nicholas Leslie Payne Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Dr Anna Michelle Sturrock Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Dr Martha Patricia Rincon Diaz Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Professor John Robert Britton Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Dr Ben Parker Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Dr David John McKenzie Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Dr Faye Helen Moyes Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Ada Fontrondona-Eslava Trustee 31 July 2022
None on record
Professor Colin William Bean Trustee 31 July 2022
None on record
Dr Constantino Macias Garcia Trustee 31 July 2022
None on record
Dr Catherine Christine Hayden Gutmann Roberts Trustee 31 July 2022
None on record
Dr Dorte Bekkevold Trustee 31 July 2022
None on record
Dr Domino Joyce Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record
Professor Holly Shiels Trustee 07 July 2021
THE COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Brian Hayden Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record
Dr Ian McCarthy Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record
Dr James Fergus Turnbull Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record
Dr Colin Ean Adams Trustee 17 July 2019
None on record
Dr Ian James Winfield Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £656.02k £600.33k £521.52k £568.89k £611.87k
Total expenditure £433.37k £364.73k £525.29k £506.75k £593.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £12.07k
Income - Other trading activities £590.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £10.72k £552.91k £468.00k £507.77k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £55.30k £47.42k £53.52k £61.13k £75.10k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £524.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £373.56k £298.61k £429.61k £467.89k £557.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £38.10k £38.86k £36.18k
Expenditure - Governance £4.11k £22.27k £0 £0 £51.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £298.23k £11.31k £80.31k £101.59k £62.79k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £38.10k £38.86k £36.18k
Expenditure - Other £59.81k £66.13k £57.58k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.06k £1.44k £948 £473 £202
Long-term investments £2.39m £2.54m £3.03m £2.36m £2.73m
Other assets £405.24k £707.64k £571.62k £793.47k £693.13k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £30.12k £65.22k £145.36k £97.89k £124.30k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brabners Llp
Horton House
Exchange Flags
LIVERPOOL
L2 3YL
Phone:
0151 600 3131