Financial history THE HORNCASTLE MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 256553
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £48.82k £36.01k £33.36k £31.90k £33.64k
Total expenditure £55.28k £28.21k £86.07k £47.11k £40.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.00k £2.67k N/A N/A