Financial history THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF HEAD AND NECK ONCOLOGISTS

Charity Number: 257199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £48.32k £59.19k £59.25k £55.75k £31.38k
Total expenditure £33.34k £52.38k £44.12k £46.40k £32.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A