THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF HEAD AND NECK ONCOLOGISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research sponsorship. Provides advice and information relevant to the management of patients with head and neck cancer and the provision of healthcare services to improve the management of patients with head and neck cancer.Runs an academic meeting to further knowledge about the disease processes and management of patients with head and neck cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 November 1968: Standard registration
- BAHNO (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF HEAD AND NECK ONCOLOGISTS OF GREAT BRITAIN TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Christopher Martin Nutting | Trustee | 17 May 2024 | ||||||
David Hamilton | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Schache | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Winter | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Wyn Hughes | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.03k | £48.32k | £59.19k | £59.25k | £55.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.61k | £33.34k | £52.38k | £44.12k | £46.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH OCTOBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION OF 28 APRIL 1995, 7 OCTOBER 1998 AND 26 APRIL 2002 as amended on 17 May 2020 as amended on 13 May 2022
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF ONCOLOGY APPERTAINING TO THE HEAD AND NECK AND THE MEDICAL SURGICAL RADIO-THERAPEUTIC PATHOLOGICAL CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AND SIMILAR PROBLEMS IN RELATION THERETO AND PROMOTING ONCOLOGICAL RESEARCH APPERTAINING TO THE HEAD AND NECK AND MIDICAL SURGICAL RADIO-THERAPEUTIC PATHOLOGICAL CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AND SIMILAR PROBLEMS IN RELATION THERETO.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL MARSDEN HOSPITAL
FULHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW3 6JJ
- Phone:
- 02078082731
- Email:
- secretariat@bahno.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window