MANCHESTER JEWISH COMMUNITY CARE

Charity number: 257238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Day centre for Jewish elderly, blind and physically disabled people or any other catergory of individual who is deemed to be in need of such assistance. Serving the community with physical, social & emotional care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £404,646
Total expenditure: £567,447

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Lancashire
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 December 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NICKY ALLIANCE DAY CENTRE (Working name)
  • MANCHESTER JEWISH BLIND SOCIETY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Benjamin Ellis Senior Trustee 30 December 2024
None on record
Michael David Hart Trustee 30 December 2024
None on record
Michael Moore Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record
JEFFREY MICHAEL LEWIS Trustee
None on record
RONALD LESTER LEVENE Trustee
None on record
BRIAN WHITE Trustee
JACK LIVINGSTONE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MANCHESTER JEWISH COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
MEDEQUIP4KIDS
Received: On time
THE UNHEARD VOICES TRUST
Received: On time
MANCHESTER JEWISH PHILANTHROPIC
Received: On time
THE UNHEARD VOICES TRUST
Received: On time
NIGEL ALLIANCE OBE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £349.30k £647.71k £476.21k £338.07k £404.65k
Total expenditure £618.71k £527.15k £468.91k £545.48k £567.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £16.24k £17.97k
Income from government grants £8.53k £25.00k N/A N/A £2.30k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £456.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £700 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £143.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £21.98k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £25.13k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £6.33k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £462.82k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £45.76k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £18.57k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £7.53k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £18.57k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 December 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 December 2022 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 APRIL 2004 (AND SUBJECT TO A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S. 96(5) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 21 DECEMBER 2004)
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE ASSISTANCE IN ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE WAYS MENTIONED BELOW (OR IN ANY OTHER WAY DETERMINED BY THE COUNCIL HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO) OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH (TOGETHER WITH THEIR DEPENDENTS) WHO ARE TOTALLY BLIND OR REGISTERED BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED OR ANY OTHER CATEGORY OF INDIVIDUAL WHO THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM TO BE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE:- A) BY THE PROVISION BY THE CHARITY ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER APPROPRIATE BODIES OF THE SOCIAL RESIDENTIAL AND DAY CENTRE SERVICES AND OTHER APPROPRIATE FACILITIES; B) BY PROVIDING WEEKLY OR PERIODIC FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR GIFTS IN KIND IN CASE OF NEED BY WAY OF GRANT, PENSION OR LOAN OF SUCH AMOUNT OR AMOUNTS AS MAY BE FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINED BY THE COUNCIL; C) BY THE PROVISION ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE OTHER APPROPRIATE BODIES OF WELFARE SERVICES OF ALL KINDS; D) BY ANY AND ALL OTHER MEANS CONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING MAIN OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY. PROVIDED THAT ALL THE CHARITY'S ABOVE MENTIONED OBJECTS SHALL BE WHOLLY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE MANCHESTER AND DISTRICT.
Registration history
  • 21 December 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
85 MIDDLETON ROAD
CRUMPSALL
MANCHESTER
M8 4JY
Phone:
01617400111