CROSBY GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theatrical performances of the works of Gilbert & Sullivan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 19 November 1968: Standard registration
- CROSBY GILBERT AND SULLIVAN AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roderick James Walker | Chair | 07 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Josie Hardman | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Crichton | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Green | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Shahin | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Williams | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Williams | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Taylor | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANNE CARDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.77k | £10.36k | £5.50k | £9.26k | £19.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.16k | £8.20k | £2.58k | £13.35k | £12.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AMENDED 3RD OCTOBER 1968 AS AMENDED 27 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE WORKS OF GILBERT & SULLIVAN AND TO IMPROVE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC TASTE IN THOSE WORKS.
Area of benefit
CROSBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
55a Oxford Road
Waterloo
LIVERPOOL
L22 8QE
- Phone:
- 01512819254
- Email:
- treasurer.crosby@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window