ST ANDREW'S PARISH HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards grants to organisations working with children in the locality of St Andrew's Church, Nottinghm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 16 January 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHN HOLLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Proctor | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Hughes | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Linda Patricia Bignall | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Leonard Waymark | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||
PAUL MELVIN LANGLEY | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nikola Voce | Trustee | 19 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
ALWYN FOSTER Chairman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.13k | £7.31k | £6.98k | £6.45k | £7.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £147 | £2.11k | £35.82k | £642 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE OF TRUST DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1913
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR DIVINE WORSHIP. 2. TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE'S ORGANISATIONS. 3. TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR LECTURES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND DOCTRINE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. ANDREW'S NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 ST. ANNS HILL
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 4LA
- Phone:
- 01159626510
- Email:
- d.moss553@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window