MRS WHETHERLY'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 257825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £5,407
Total expenditure: £10,183

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark William Douglas Little Chair 02 March 2017
THE MACLAREN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MACLAREN TRUST
Received: On time
DAWN ELIZABETH EVELYN PERRETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.35k £5.70k £5.47k £5.53k £5.41k
Total expenditure £14.92k £7.36k £9.28k £2.62k £10.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 February 2025 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 August 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 April 2021 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Oddington Hill Farm
Oddington Road
Stow on The Wold
CHELTENHAM
GL54 1AL
Phone:
07920202393
Website:

No information available