Financial history MISSION ROOM, SCHOOL HOUSE AND CHURCH CLUB

Charity number: 257980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.86k £4.09k £6.63k £7.40k £6.29k
Total expenditure £3.99k £4.50k £15.86k £7.46k £6.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A