THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help all ex -serving members of The Northamptonshire Yeomanry or their dependants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 April 1969: Standard registration
- 16 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | £2.83k | £2.76k | £1.94k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.81k | £1.36k | £1.32k | £1.96k | £27.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 04/01/2011
Charitable objects
A) IN THE ASSISTANCE OR BENEFIT OF ANY SUCH PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING AT ANY TIME SERVED IN THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY OR BEING DEPENDENTS, WIVES, WIDOWS (WHETHER OR NOT RE-MARRIED) OR ISSUE OF PERSONS (WHETHER LIVING OR DEAD SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE IN NEED OF CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE OR BENEFIT. B) IN MAKING GRANTS TO ANY CHARITY OR CHARITABLE FUND OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION (WHETHER THE SAME BE A MILITARY OR CIVIL CHARITY) EXISTING OR HERE-AFTER ESTABLISHED WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BENEFITS THE PERSONS REFERRED TO IN (A) ABOVE WHETHER OR NOT THE OBJECTS OF ANY SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITABLE FUND OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION SHALL EXPRESSLY INCLUDE PROVISIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS. C) IN MAKING GRANTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE COMMEMORATIVE EVENTS ARRANGED AND APPROVED BY THE NYA WHICH HAVE BEEN SET UP TO REMEMBER THOSE WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY SERVED WITH THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY AND TO KEEP THE SPIRIT OF THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY ALIVE AND IN ADDITION TO MAKE GRANTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS TO COMMEMORATIVE RESEARCH ACTIVITIES IN A MANNER IN WHICH THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window