SLAVIC GOSPEL ASSOCIATION (BRITISH SECTION) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to reach with the Gospel of Jesus Christ the 300 million Slavic people and others throughout the world, and to relieve need, in those parts of the world in which the Association operates. In practice this is accomplished by assisting the Church in Central and Eastern Europe and Central Asia to become fully equipped to fulfil the great commission of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,551,946
Donations and legacies | £1.49m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £18.65k | |
Investments | £42.09k | |
Other | £1.43k |
Total expenditure:
£1,725,636
Raising funds | £75.16k | |
Charitable activities | £1.65m | |
Other | £0 |
£5,529 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £75.16k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.65m |
People

11 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Hungary
- Kazakhstan
- Kyrgyzstan
- Macedonia
- Moldova
- Mongolia
- Poland
- Romania
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Tajikistan
- Turkmenistan
- Ukraine
- Uzbekistan
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Frank Andris Ievins | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert West | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond William Trainer | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|||||
John Knox | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eric MacDonald | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr C Smith | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DONALD HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18m | £1.45m | £1.33m | £2.73m | £1.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00m | £1.01m | £1.44m | £2.17m | £1.73m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £64.09k | £30.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.14m | £1.44m | £1.32m | £2.71m | £1.49m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £25.83k | £4.95k | £7.49k | £12.62k | £18.65k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.63k | £3.02k | £878 | £8.06k | £42.09k | |
|
Income - Other | £930 | £0 | £91 | £0 | £1.43k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £347.09k | £517.65k | £283.33k | £191.96k | £60.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £924.68k | £975.03k | £1.40m | £2.10m | £1.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £78.53k | £38.03k | £39.80k | £75.66k | £75.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.61k | £11.73k | £12.46k | £13.33k | £15.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £159.95k | £152.22k | £146.82k | £160.89k | £151.17k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £150.02k | £155.55k | |
|
Other assets | £1.37m | £1.82m | £1.71m | £2.06m | £1.90m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.77k | £10.33k | £12.43k | £16.30k | £19.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH JANUARY 1969 AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL TO SLAVIC SPEAKING PEOPLES AND OTHERS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ANY MEANS THE ASSOCIATION THINKS PROPER. TO RELIEVE NEED, POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING, INCLUDING STARVATION, ILLNESS AND ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL IMPAIRMENT AND AFFLICTION IN THOSE PARTS OF THE WORLD IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OPERATES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Little Church Street
Rugby
Warwickshire
CV21 3AW
- Phone:
- 01788220699
- Email:
- office@sga.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window