Financial history THE FAIRBANK SOCIETY

Charity number: 258882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £498.77k £451.48k £508.57k £536.53k £486.17k
Total expenditure £471.76k £453.62k £435.29k £507.28k £534.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £5.00k £320 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £478.57k £510.97k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £22.29k £22.86k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £2.70k £2.37k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £5.00k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £435.29k £507.28k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £13.16k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A