THE MUSIC THERAPY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of research into music therapy. Provision of grants to music therapy students. Support for music therapy projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 August 1969: Standard registration
- 21 March 2020: Funds received from 1114703 MUSIC FOR ALICE (MFA)
- THE MUSIC THERAPY CHARITY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Neta Spiro | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Clarke | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Leanne O'Keeffe | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacques Launay | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Benedict Charles George Richardson | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David M Greenberg | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Pauline Meadows | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Rachel Darnley-Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SWAIN CIPFA | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|||||
DOMINIC ADAM DELAFORCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH WALDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR KATE THOMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR HELEN ODELL-MILLER OBEBAMPhil | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.43k | £54.97k | £42.94k | £51.17k | £38.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.78k | £104.23k | £92.21k | £71.28k | £89.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH JUNE 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16TH NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
1. TO PREVENT, RELIEVE AND CURE SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH OF EVERY KIND WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL BY THE USE OF THE ARTS, MUSIC AND COLOUR THERAPY. 2. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE USE OF ARTS, MUSIC THERAPY AND COLOUR THERAPY FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BAKERS FIELD
DRY DRAYTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 8EG
- Phone:
- 01954780409
- Email:
- info@musictherapy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window