M AND H CADBURY TRUST

Charity number: 259083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes donations to charities and organisations..

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £3,483
Total expenditure: £3,663

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Cadbury Chair 11 March 2011
STARCROSS SPORTS AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
WILLIAM J M CADBURY Trustee 11 March 2011
None on record
DUNCAN JAMES CADBURY Trustee
None on record
MARK J H CADBURY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.84k £2.54k £3.27k £3.63k £3.48k
Total expenditure £4.25k £2.87k £3.71k £4.16k £3.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SPINACRE
SOUTHBROOK
STARCROSS
EXETER
EX6 8QX
Phone:
01626890466
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available