YEOMANRY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial welfare assistance to those who have served in Yeomanry Regiments and their dependants who are experiencing hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CW ELWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Major General Simon Howe Brooks-Ward CVO CBE TD | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Toby Henry Mcintosh Gaddum TD | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Alexandra Gail Milne | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Alexander John Mallin | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Keith James Durward FCA | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
Colonel Oliver John Harben Chamberlain QVRM TD DL | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
RUTHVEN AUSTEN BURDON-COOPER | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Brigadier HUGH JOHN ROBERTSON QVRM TD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.31k | £29.04k | £30.47k | £32.34k | £35.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.96k | £28.45k | £36.18k | £44.27k | £42.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH JULY 1903, SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT OF 30TH JULY 1930; SCHEMES OF 24TH APRIL 1956, 29TH SEPTEMBER 1961, 4TH AUGUST 1966 AND 10 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
ASSISTING ANY BENEFICIARY EITHER BY WAY OF DIRECT MONEY OR BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING OR OTHER NECESSARIES, (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST).
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Stone Buildings
Lincoln's Inn
LONDON
WC2 3TG
- Phone:
- 01993878516
- Email:
- chwinkley@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window