ROYAL ARMY CHAPLAINS' DEPARTMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the efficiency of the RACHD, in particular, but not exclusively, by: * Maintaining contact between past & present members of the department * Fostering espirit-de-corps, comradeship & welfare of the department. Also to relieve, either generally or individually, Chaplains or formaer Chaplains or the dependants of such persons who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 March 1970: Standard registration
- 14 December 2016: Funds received from 1116642 CHARITY OF IDA FRANCES BLACKETT
- R A CHD ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael David Parker | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patrick Cable | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Gordon Meikle | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeremy Peter Hellier | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Francis | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Barrett | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Stephen Alastair Blakey | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Ret'd Tim Purdon | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.13k | £57.38k | £90.53k | £29.48k | £26.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.31k | £20.08k | £24.02k | £100.56k | £32.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 07 December 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27/02/1970 AS AMENDED ON 04/08/2005 AS AMENDED ON 01/08/2007 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/2011 AND AS ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 02/09/2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL ARMY CHAPLAINS' DEPARTMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE DEPARTMENT; AND (2) FOSTERING ESPRIT-DE-CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND WELFARE OF THE DEPARTMENT. (B) TO RELIEVE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, CHAPLAINS OR FORMER CHAPLAINS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOD Chaplains (Army)
Army HQ
IDL3 Blenheim Building
Marlborough Lines
Monxton Road
ANDOVER
- Phone:
- 01264886452
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window