Governance JEWISH BLIND & PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 259480

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 12 September 1969: Standard registration
- 16 February 2016: Funds received from 236795 MAURICE MYERS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
- 23 February 2022: Funds received from 803574 THE DAVID AND LINDA SCHNEIDERMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
- 07 May 2025: Funds received from 208540 JEWISH ASSOCIATION FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED
- 19 May 2025: Funds received from 1071288 THE EPHRAIM 1998 CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- JEWISH BLIND & DISABLED (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.