Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF HARTLEPOOL BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 259527
Charity reporting is overdue by 1101 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 370 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 370 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 736 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 736 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1101 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1101 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 January 2022 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required