THE BIRMINGHAM MOSQUE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Daily, Friday and Eid prayers. Family support service for family disputes, divorce, marriage introductions and funeral services. Out of School hours activities Organise educational trips, sport and recreational activities, event study circles, health and fitness activities, classes for martial arts. Mosque tours and briefings for visitors and Interfaith dialogue and seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,273,989
Donations and legacies | £1.07m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £208.51k |
Total expenditure:
£652,727
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £652.73k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,400 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £652.73k | |
Retained for future use | £621.26k |
People

19 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 31 October 1969: Standard registration
- CENTRAL MOSQUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD AFZAL | Chair | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
MUHAMMAD MOHIUDDIN QAMAR | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ZAFAR ALAM CHAUDHARY | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
MUHAMMAD SARFRAZ MADNI | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ALI YOUSIF MOHAMED | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
MOHAMMAD ASGHAR | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ALLAH DITTA | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
MOHAMMED AKRAM | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
AHMAD MAKHDOOM CHISHTI | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Mahmoud Akhtar | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
NASSAR MAHMOOD | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mohammed Najib | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
TAHIR MAHMOOD ALAM | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr MOHAMMED HANIF | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
TARIQ HUSSAIN | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MAQBOOL AHMED | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|||||||
ABDUL REHMAN MAHMOOD | Trustee | 12 March 1970 |
|
|
||||||
MAHMOOD AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ABDUL YAHIA RAKEEB | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £624.06k | £987.14k | £1.34m | £1.55m | £1.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £481.79k | £376.60k | £502.82k | £667.62k | £652.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £76.39k | £22.33k | N/A | £7.40k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £430.09k | £840.19k | £1.18m | £1.30m | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £18.23k | £14.14k | £12.15k | £5.92k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £175.74k | £132.80k | £151.76k | £215.31k | £208.51k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £481.79k | £376.60k | £502.82k | £667.62k | £652.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.86k | £11.73k | £27.02k | £34.32k | £22.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £50.38k | £13.61k | £27.39k | £105.77k | £41.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.17m | £2.79m | £4.13m | £4.86m | £5.38m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.99m | £2.02m | £1.45m | £1.56m | £1.68m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £142.85k | £173.75k | £109.82k | £95.98k | £116.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
5.1.1. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, WEDDINGS, FUNERAL SERVICES, EXHIBITIONS, THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PLACES OF PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP BY PERSONS PROFESSING THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL CENTRES, A SOCIAL AND CULTURAL CENTRE AND OTHER PLACES OF STUDY, THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF CEMETERIES AND BURIAL PLACES FOR THE BURIAL, IN ACCORDANCE WITH ISLAMIC RITES, OF PERSONS PROFESSING THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAMIC BELIEF AND PRACTICE TO HELP ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE RELIGION OF ISLAM; 5.1.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF ISLAM; 5.1.3. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND 5.1.4. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THOSE IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF ISLAM IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRMINGHAM CENTRAL MOSQUE
180 BELGRAVE MIDDLEWAY
HIGHGATE
BIRMINGHAM
B12 0XS
- Phone:
- 00441214405355
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window