WHITEHILL CHASE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE LOCAL TO BORDON. THE TRUSTEES DO NOT MAKE GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 1969: Standard registration
- WHITEHILL CHASE FOUNDATION TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Sebastian Lawrence-Mills | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Schrager von Altishofen | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Helen Louise Morgan | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR MORGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
CATHERINE DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.81k | £78.59k | £73.03k | £88.35k | £127.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.19k | £318.79k | £83.42k | £138.28k | £163.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1969 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION AND APPOINTMENT DATED 17/11/2003
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE TRUST FUND TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS IN THE SCHEDULED TERRITORIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE AND TO TAKE INTO CONSIDERATION AND PAY SPECIAL REGARD TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE OBJECT OR PURPOSES OF WHITEHILL CHASE ASSOCIATION LIMITED (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3 AND 4 OF TRUST DEED DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1969)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Thatch
Frampton Mansell
STROUD
Gloucestershire
GL6 8JG
- Phone:
- 01666840529
- Email:
- enquiries.wcft@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window